skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 22:44:32 PM

Benhabib, Berna

CPSO#: 94247

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Turkish

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
510 Southdale Rd E
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone: (519)914-5202
Fax: (519)914-5204 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

1472 Huron St
Huron Medical Centre
London ON  N5V 2E5
Canada
Phone: (519)601-6640
Fax: (519)601-6642
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hyde Park Care Clinic
2-1195 Hyde Park Rd.
London ON  N6H 5K6
Canada
Phone: 519-474-0996
Fax: 519-472-3760
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

1866 Oxford Street West
Unit 2
London ON  N6K 0J8
Canada
Phone: 519-657-1919
Fax: 519-472-8017
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Berna Benhabib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Benhabib ( CPSO# 94247 )

Business Address:
640 Hyde Park Road
Suite 4
London ON  N6H 3S1
Phone Number: (519) 641-3627

Business Address:
510 Southdale Road East
Suite 101
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: 519-914-5202

Business Address:
1472 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 2E5
Phone Number: 519-601-6640

Business Address:
1866 Oxford St W
Unit 2
London ON  N6K 0J8
Phone Number: 519-657-1919

Business Address:
1195 Hyde Park Road
Suite 2
London ON  N6H 5K6
Phone Number: 519-474-0996

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BERNA BENHABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENHABIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2014