skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 10:03:10 AM

Engle, John Raymond

CPSO#: 94246

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ohio State University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kincardine Community Medical Clinic, 44 Queen Street, Kincardine, ON, N2Z 3C1
Date Received: 02 Jun 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2016