THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:14:15 PM
Hassan, Tariq Mahmood
CPSO#:
94215
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 5444900 Ext. 53163
Fax: (613) 540-6113
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TARIQ MAHMOOD HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2020 |