THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:34:34 AM
Stone, Karina Alexandra
CPSO#:
94198
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Central de Venezuela, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Centre for Addiction and Mental Health, Health Records Department, 175 College Street, Toronto, ON, M5T 1P7
Date Received: 23 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2016 |