THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:56:20 AM
Imran, Aatika
CPSO#:
94183
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Quaid-i-Azam University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
358 Oxford Street East
London ON N6A 1V7
Phone: (519) 438 0002
Fax: (519) 438 0888
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jan 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AATIKA IMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IMRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2010 to 07 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2013 |