skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/10/21 9:16:52 AM

Getgood, Alan Martin John

CPSO#: 94154

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine
3M Center
University of Western Ontario
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-4003
Fax: (519) 850-2991 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alan Getgood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Getgood ( CPSO# 94154 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Fowler Kennedy Sport Medicine Clinic
3M Centre
University of Western Ontario
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-4003


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:13 Sep 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2010 to 18 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Aug 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Alan Martin John Getgood may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Orthopedics,  University of Western Ontario, in which
                        Dr. Getgood holds an academic  appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Getgood no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.