THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:44:16 AM
Laird, Philip Rodney
CPSO#:
94129
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Calgary, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
33 CF Health Services Centre
4 Entretien Ave
CFB Kingston
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
Phone: 613 541 5010 Ext. 3232
Fax: 613 817 9407
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:19 Oct 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:10 Feb 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP RODNEY LAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIRD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 10 Feb 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2010 |