THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 11:46:13 AM
McNaull, Margaret Elizabeth
CPSO#:
94112
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-41 Frederick St
Orillia ON L3V 5W6
Phone: 705.326.7727
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARGARET ELIZABETH MCNAULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAULL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Jul 2010
EL - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 20 Sep 2010 to 05 Nov 2010
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2011 |