THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:13:20 AM
Barnett Tapia, Carolina
CPSO#:
94087
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Neurology
200 Elizabeth Street. 5EC Room 334
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3957
Fax: 416-340-3297
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Chile
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:15 Sep 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |