THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:28:24 PM
Nada, Ossama Tarek Sayed
CPSO#:
94071
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
CF - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
CF - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2013 |