THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:11:44 AM
Fairgrieve, Christopher Douglas
CPSO#:
94026
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St.
Room 17013
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-274-3562
Fax: 1-855-437-1609
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Unit 2201
1150 Jervis Street
Vancouver, BC V6E 2C8
Date Received: 22 May 2015
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jan 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS FAIRGRIEVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAIRGRIEVE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Feb 2016 to 11 Mar 2016
EL - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2019 |