THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 6:06:47 AM
Everett, Tobias Christopher
CPSO#:
93998
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Bristol Medical School, University of Br, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:10 Nov 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2022 |
|
Active |