THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:51:43 PM
Cohen-Lyons, Phillip Daniel
CPSO#:
93988
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2640 Rutherford Rd.
Suite 202
Vaughan ON L4K 0H3
Phone: 647-352-9622
Fax: 905-303-1007
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:08 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILLIP DANIEL COHEN-LYONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN-LYONS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |