THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:20:01 PM
Cardinal Cartier, Sandrine
CPSO#:
93982
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3280 Bloor St West
Centre Tower, 8th floor
Suite #802
Toronto ON M8X 2X3
Phone: (416) 926-2698
Fax: 416-324-7905
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDRINE CARDINAL CARTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARDINAL CARTIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2016 |