skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 30/06/22 21:33:37 PM

Ma, Grace Chi Ming

CPSO#: 93931

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education: Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
3South-376
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6444 Ext. 4138
Fax: 416-756-6024 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Doctors Ma and Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ma ( CPSO# 93931 )
Dr. P. Wong ( CPSO# 94201 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
3South-376
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GRACE CHI MING MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2011