skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 15:07:46 PM

Twose, Richelle Marguerite

CPSO#: 93899

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
7G-114
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 4165306000 Ext. 3369
Fax: 4165306405 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHELLE MARGUERITE TWOSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TWOSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 10 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 10 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015