THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:05:13 AM
Lazaric, Daniel Mario
CPSO#:
93883
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Wilderman Medical Clinic
100 - 8054 Yonge St
Thronhill ON L4J 1W3
Date Received: 16 Apr 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Nova Scotia
Prince Edward Island
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2019 |