THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:27:11 PM
Nguyen, Erika Thuy-Ha
CPSO#:
93873
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
09 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 04 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 10 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Paediatric Anaesthesia
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Sep 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Sep 2016 |