skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 3:25:43 AM

Clement, Sylvianne

CPSO#: 93768

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4289 innes road
Ottawa ON  K1E 0A4
Phone: (613) 366-7557
Fax: (613) 212-8893 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sylvianne Clement Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Clement ( CPSO# 93768 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1458

Business Address:
4289 Innes Rd
Your Health-Votre Santé
Orléans ON  K1E 0A8
Phone Number: 6133667557

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYLVIANNE CLEMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012