THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:54:03 AM
Ashdown, Lynn Colleen
CPSO#:
93766
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education
as of
01 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 Peter Morand Crescent
Suite 201
Ottawa ON K1G 5Z3
Phone: 613-562-5800 Ext. 2982
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LYNN COLLEEN ASHDOWN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ASHDOWN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;
(2) Dr. ASHDOWN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ASHDOWN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ASHDOWN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ASHDOWN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ASHDOWN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2024.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |