THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:56:42 AM
Cooray, Mohan Rajika
CPSO#:
93764
MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of
13 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Cooray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:08 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 13 May 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 25, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Mohan Cooray was charged with the following offences:
1. Utter Threat to Cause Death, on or about June 3, 2023, contrary to section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Causing Disturbance in or near a public place – Shouting and Insulting Language, on or about June 3, 2023, contrary to section 175(1)(a)(i) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: August 25, 2023
Place of Charge: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Services
Source:
Other
Active Date: July 4, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On June 4, 2023, the following Bail Conditions were imposed on Mohan Cooray:
1. Cooray must reside at an address approved by surety.
2. Cooray must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named person EXCEPT in the presence of or through legal counsel for the purposes of civil litigation.
3. Cooray must attend mental health counseling and sign all releases as directed by surety.