skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 3:47:40 AM

Hussein, Mohammad Hasaballa

CPSO#: 93663

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Oct 2020
EXPIRY DATE
28 Feb 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Oct 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
112-330 Bronte St S
Milton ON  L9T 7X1 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

112-330 BRONTE ST S
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohammad Hussein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussein ( CPSO# 93663 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone Number: (905) 636-9387

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:21 Oct 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jun 2021
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jun 2021 Active
 1. Dr. MOHAMMAD HASABALLA HUSSEIN may practise pediatrics at Seashell Medical Centre in Milton, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on February 28, 2022.
 
3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. HUSSEIN's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. HUSSEIN's practice, or

(iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site assessment of Dr. HUSSEIN's practice unsatisfactory.

Note: This certificate is issued on October 20, 2020, and will expire on or before February 28, 2022, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.