skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/10/21 8:52:20 AM

Ahluwalia, Romy Romeet

CPSO#: 93639

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue plastic surgery
1802 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 3Z1
Phone: 416-789-9979 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Romy Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ahluwalia ( CPSO# 93639 )

Business Address:
1802 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 3Z1
Phone Number: (204) 294-2947

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:12 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROMY ROMEET AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2015