THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:00:33 PM
Joseph, Jay Ashvin
CPSO#:
93605
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.A. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2021
Corporation Name: J.A. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2023 |