THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:10:20 PM
Pineda Rivas, Maria de Los Angeles
CPSO#:
93598
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Pineda, Maria de Los Angeles (used until: 07 Feb 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
311 Commercial St
Milton ON L9T 3Z9
Phone: 905-875-2280
Fax: 905-875-9172
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:16 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA DE LOS ANGELES PINEDA RIVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINEDA RIVAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Feb 2016 to 13 Mar 2016
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
McMaster University, 14 Mar 2016 to 10 Apr 2016
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 19 Dec 2016 to 15 Jan 2017
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Apr 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2017 |