THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:50:03 PM
Charland, David Andre
CPSO#:
93587
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients should contact Medica One to request a copy of their medical record.
Medica One
2079 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington, ON L7R 1E2
Tel: 905-634-1625
Fax: 905-634-5332
Date Received: 05 Jun 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:11 Nov 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDRE CHARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2012 |