skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 17:57:18 PM

Harvey, Caroline Ruth Ann

CPSO#: 93585

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2021
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Armstrong, Caroline Ruth Ann (used until: 14 Jun 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Dec 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 11 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 11 Mar 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Mar 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 14 Sep 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Sep 2020 to 26 Apr 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Apr 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Dec 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Dec 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2021