THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:01:12 AM
Skeldon, Sean Christopher Toshiaki
CPSO#:
93564
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Summerville Family Health Team
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 211
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 621-9700
Fax: (416) 621-4438
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jan 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEAN CHRISTOPHER TOSHIAKI SKELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKELDON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2017 |