skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 1:48:44 AM

Slobodian, Laurissa Michelle

CPSO#: 93534

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
87 Mill St. North
Newcastle ON  L1B1H8
Phone: 9059871896 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laurissa Slobodian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Slobodian ( CPSO# 93534 )

Business Address:
87 Mill Street North
Newcastle ON  L1B 1H8
Phone Number: (905) 987-1896

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURISSA MICHELLE SLOBODIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLOBODIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012