THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:23:06 AM
Abaeian, Mitra
CPSO#:
93518
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
210 Centrum Blvd
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
Phone: 613-830-1771
Fax: 613-837-3781
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:15 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MITRA ABAEIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABAEIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 08 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 02 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2015 |