THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 16:33:01 PM
Deva, Djeven Parameshvara
CPSO#:
93514
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3243
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:22 Mar 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Apr 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Mar 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Mar 2019 |
|
Active |