skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 2:15:44 AM

Alzahrani, Hasan Musaad Ali Hilas

CPSO#: 93511

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Khalid University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 21 Oct 2010
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2011 to 07 Jun 2011
PEAP - CF - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013