THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:26:00 PM
Afridi, Sajida Parveen
CPSO#:
93493
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
117 King St E
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Phone: 905-721-7732
Fax: 905-721-4166
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:25 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAJIDA PARVEEN AFRIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFRIDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2019 |