THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:34:40 PM
Nayar, Ajay
CPSO#:
93475
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Aug 2013 to 03 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 04 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ajay Nayar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 14, 2017:
Dr. Nayar is not a member of the College. He held a certificate of registration authorizing postgraduate education in Ontario between July 1, 2010 and June 30, 2014.
The College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Nayar engaged in professional misconduct. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Nayar has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario. No referral has been made to the Discipline Committee.
Download Full Document (PDF)