THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:02:53 AM
Guron, Namrata Kaur
CPSO#:
93449
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:325 Milner Avenue
Suite 410
Scarborough, ON
M1B 5N1
Phone 416-284-4744
Date Received: 20 Jul 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2015 to 20 Nov 2015
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 09 Oct 2019
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2020 |