THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:58:30 AM
Khosravani, Houman
CPSO#:
93444
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 89124
Fax: (647) 800-6745
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOUMAN KHOSRAVANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOSRAVANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2015 |