skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 22:22:05 PM

Malek, Anna Maria

CPSO#: 93435

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ellis Park Medical
1959 Bloor Street West Unit 2
Toronto ON  M6S 1M4
Phone: (416) 639-6321
Fax: (416) 639-6322 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 18 2021
Corporation Name: Linder Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Linder ( CPSO# 81391 )
Dr. A. Malek ( CPSO# 93435 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malek ( CPSO# 93435 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012