skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/06/22 22:11:23 PM

Zeidan Shwiri, Tawfiq

CPSO#: 93417

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CardioMatters Diagnostics
11-14 398 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X3 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

CardioMatters Diagnostics
658 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CardioMatters Diagnostics
6633 York Regional Rd 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Dec 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAWFIQ ZEIDAN SHWIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEIDAN SHWIRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2022