THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:40:42 PM
Duan, Erick Huaileigh
CPSO#:
93416
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERICK HUAILEIGH DUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |