skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 23:33:37 PM

Poddar, Megha

CPSO#: 93361

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Edward Street, Unit 1500
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: 416-237-0104
Fax: 647-478-2415 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

35 Upper Centennial Parkway, Suite
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: 833-962-5359
Fax: 888-825-1505
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Seth ( CPSO# 90639 )
Dr. M. Poddar ( CPSO# 93361 )

Business Address:
34 Ellis Park Road
Woodstock ON  M6S 2V3
Phone Number: (416) 671-5114


Corporation Name: M. Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Seth ( CPSO# 90639 )
Dr. M. Poddar ( CPSO# 93361 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9

Business Address:
Suite 1500
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 237-0104

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite 2D
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEGHA PODDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2015 to 15 May 2016
CF - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014