THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 23:32:19 PM
Das, Jennifer Lea
CPSO#:
93358
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Davis, Jennifer Lea (used until: 28 Jul 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Thomas Jefferson University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kindercare Pediatrics
301-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Developmental Pediatrics |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEA DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2017 |