THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:49:53 AM
Sennikov, Alexei
CPSO#:
93351
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Belarusian State Medical University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Nov 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2012 |
|
Active |