THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:38:19 PM
Abdul Wahab, Muzafar Gani
CPSO#:
93346
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Madurai Kamaraj University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Division of Neonatal Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73689
Fax: (905) 521-5007
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. M.G. Abdul Wahab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jul 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
|
Active |