THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:00:32 AM
Bali, Amardeep Kaur
CPSO#:
93296
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Spanish, Urdu
Education: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Carling Height Family Health Centre
124 Barker Street
London ON N5Y 1Y1
Phone: 519204 2775
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. K. Bali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMARDEEP KAUR BALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2014 |