skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 17:24:23 PM

Nizzero, Christopher John Louis

CPSO#: 93274

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CNC medical
2416 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5H5
Phone: (705) 222-0079
Fax: (705) 523-1414 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Nizzero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nizzero ( CPSO# 93274 )

Business Address:
CNC Medical
2416 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5H5
Phone Number: (705) 222-0079

Business Address:
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN LOUIS NIZZERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIZZERO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012