THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 18:39:15 PM
Bazzarelli, Amy Kathleen
CPSO#:
93225
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Saint Joseph Hospital
3080 Prince Edward St.
Vancouver BC V5T 3N4
Phone: 604-874-1141
Fax: 604-877-8506
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Manitoba
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:15 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMY KATHLEEN BAZZARELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZZARELLI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jul 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2017 |