THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 14:54:31 PM
Grzyb, Magdalena Julia
CPSO#:
93206
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Phone: 647-352-2554
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:23 Aug 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:15 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAGDALENA JULIA GRZYB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRZYB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 11 Jul 2016 to 22 Jul 2016
EL - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2017 |