skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/10/21 1:33:17 AM

Baker, Emily Sinclair

CPSO#: 93171

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300G Fourth Ave
GROW Niagara Health
St Catharines ON  L2S 0E6
Phone: 905-984-6060
Fax: 905-984-6560 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Emily Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Baker ( CPSO# 93171 )

Business Address:
300G Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0E6
Phone Number: 9059846060

Business Address:
115-245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 984-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY SINCLAIR BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016