skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 15:53:38 PM

Sandhu, Takpal Kaur

CPSO#: 93163

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Birdi, Takpal Kaur (used until: 20 May 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nairobi, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd.
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (613) 986-6384 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Takpal Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sandhu ( CPSO# 93163 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:27 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAKPAL KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2017