THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:21:00 AM
Poonah, Muhammad Fairoze
CPSO#:
93158
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Sint Eustatius, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Downtown Professional Centre
Suite 202
83 Mill St
Georgetown ON L7G 5E9
Phone: (905) 873-2402
Fax: (905) 873-2411
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD FAIROZE POONAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POONAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2012 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2019 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2023 |